Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ortega, Norma, filed a(n) Compromise Of Minor'S Claim case represented by Michael D Haight, against State Farm Insurance Company, Fry, Leona, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Halverson, Elizabeth presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHalverson, Elizabeth Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 29, 2007 |
CategoryCompromise Of Minor'S Claim |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder Approving Minor'S Compromise |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 2 Case reassigned from Judge Abbi Silver Dept 15 |
|
September 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Blocked Account Vacated |
|
August 24, 2007 | Docket Event | VERIFICATION FOR EVIDENCE OF DEPOSIT OF PROCEEDS FOR MINORS COMPROMISE | |
August 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
Conversion Case Event Type MINUTE ORDER RE: |
|
August 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER RE: Court Clerk: Pamela Humphrey Heard By: Elizabeth Halverson This case, A543907 In the Matter of Norma Ortega as Guardian ad litem for Jennifer Sanchez, was set for hearing on August 21, 2007 8:30am but was continnued to September 12, 2007 8:30am as proof of establised blocked account had not yet been submitted to the Court. However, this Court now having received proof of the establishment of the blocked account, and good cause appearing, COURT ORDERED, the hearing for September 12, 2007 is hereby VACATED, and CASE CLOSED. CASE CLOSED |
|
August 23, 2007 | Docket Event | VERIFICATION FOR EVIDENCE OF DEPOSIT OF PROCEEDS FOR MINORS COMPROMISE | |
August 21, 2007 | Docket Event | STATUS CHECK: BLOCKED ACCOUNT (VJ 8/24/07) | |
July 20, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF MINOR'S CLAIM | |
July 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Petition for Compromise of Minors Claim PETITION FOR COMPROMISE OF A MINOR'S CLAIM |
|
July 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Judgment ORDER OF APPROVAL OF MINORS CLAIM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.