Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Davis, Brenda, Davis Ii, Earl W, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Janet S. Markley, against O'Connor, Robert J, Cunningham, Randall, Cunningham, Felicity, represented by Stephen H Rogers, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Vega, Valorie J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVega, Valorie J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 26, 2007 |
CategoryNegligence - Premises Liability |
Last RefreshedNovember 26, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 15 Case reassigned from Judge Richard F Scotti Dept 2 |
|
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judicial Elections 2014 - Case Reassignment District Court Judicial Officer Reassignment 2014 Judge: Reassignment 2014 |
|
April 29, 2010 | Docket Event | NV Supreme Court Clerks Certificate/Judgment - Dismissed | |
February 04, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
January 29, 2010 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order for Dismissal | |
October 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
Reporters Transcript Reporter's Transcript of January 28, 2009 |
|
October 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Vacated Judge: Vega, Valorie J. |
|
September 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call Vacated Judge: Vega, Valorie J. |
|
September 10, 2009 | Docket Event | Receipt- Notice of Appeal | |
September 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Appeal Statement Plaintiff's Case Appeal Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.