Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Central Valley Insulation, filed a(n) Title To Property case represented by R. Scott Rasmussen, against Wolf, Michael D, Temple Development Corporation, Staples, Okson, Mishima, Dawn, Hunter, Faith L, (total of 11) See All represented by Thomas A. Ericsson, Glenn F Meier, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Adair, Valerie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAdair, Valerie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 24, 2004 |
CategoryTitle To Property |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 15 Civil Case Reassignment to Judge Joe Hardy |
|
July 21, 2010 | Docket Event | Order to Statistically Close Case | |
April 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Stipulation & Order for Dismissal Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order For Dismissal With Prejudice |
|
March 31, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order for Dismissal With Prejudice Belongs in A545209 Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order For Dismissal of Defendant Therold Adams With Prejudice |
|
March 29, 2010 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order for Dismissal With Prejudice | |
February 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Discovery Conference Colloquy re: deconsolidation and status of case. Mr. Craw stated Pltf is attempting resolution to withdraw claims and Dismiss case. COMMISSIONER RECOMMENDED, matter CONTINUED based on possible resolution; counsel to confirm settlement by letter. 4/16/10 9:00 A.M. DISCOVERY CONFERENCE Judge: Bulla, Bonnie |
|
January 28, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order Releasing and Expunging Mechanics LIens (Excluding Mechanics Lien of Interior Specialists Inc) Against APN 124-25-112-135; APN 124-25-112-130; APN 124-25-112-129 and 124-25-112-124 | |
January 26, 2010 | Docket Event | Order Releasing and Expunging Mechanics Liens (Excluding Mechanics Lien or Interior Specialists, Inc.) Against APN 124-25-112-135; APN 124-25-112-130; APN 124-25-112-129; and 124-25-112-124 | |
January 14, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order Granting Laywers Title of Nevada Inc's Motion for Summary Judgment Against Defendant Temple Development Corporation Defendant CCD Temple LLC Defendant CSC Temple LLC and Defendant Aaron Temple | |
December 30, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice to Appear for Discovery Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.