Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Jones, Colleen, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Denise L. Gentile presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDenise L. Gentile Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 15, 2000 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Adult |
Last RefreshedJune 18, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Citation Vacated - per Judge Judge: Gentile, Denise L |
|
June 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order
Judge: Gentile, Denise L |
|
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Citation to Appear and Show Cause Doc ID# 54 [54] Petition to terminate Nevada guardianship |
|
May 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Petition to Terminate Guardianship Doc ID# 53 [53] Petition to terminate Nevada guardianship - Exhibit B |
|
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibits Doc ID# 52 [52] Petition to terminate Nevada guardianship |
|
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Doc ID# 51 [51] Notice of Entry of Order-OAC |
|
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Counsel Doc ID# 50 [50] Order Appointing Counsel |
|
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing Vacated Judge: Gentile, Denise L |
|
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing to Terminate
Judge: Gentile, Denise L |
|
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Accounting and Reports Doc ID# 49 [49] Annual report of guardian |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.