Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Watson-Cameron, Sandra, Cameron, Darryl, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Voy, William O presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVoy, William O Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2000 |
CategoryDivorce - Joint Petition |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDivorce Granted |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 27, 2006 | Docket Event | Document Archive | |
November 27, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDER SCH/PER Date: 08/22/2006 Blackstone OC: HG | |
August 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
Hearing MINUTE ORDER RE: DECISION SCH/PER Date: 08/31/2006 Blackstone OC: |
|
August 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
Converted From Blackstone MINUTE ORDER RE: UNDER SUBMISSION Judge: Voy, William O |
|
August 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
Hearing MINUTE ORDER RE: UNDER SUBMISSION SCH/PER Date: 08/31/2006 Blackstone OC: |
|
August 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
Converted From Blackstone MINUTE ORDER RE: DECISION Judge: Voy, William O |
|
August 29, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDER SCH/PER Date: 08/22/2006 Blackstone OC: HG | |
August 25, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDER SCH/PER Date: Blackstone OC: | |
August 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
Hearing DEFT'S OPPOSITION AND COUNTERMOTION TO MODIFY CUSTODY, VISITATION AND SUPPORT Judge: Voy, William O |
|
August 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
Motion PLTF'S MOTION FOR CHANGE IN ORDER FOR CHILD CUSTODY Judge: Voy, William O |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.