Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rivera, Crystal, Rivera, Adelaido, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Lueck, Robert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLueck, Robert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2000 |
CategoryDivorce - Joint Petition |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDivorce Granted |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment Reassigned from Department E to Department P |
|
April 11, 2006 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING SCH/PER Date: 04/11/2006 Blackstone OC: TP | |
April 11, 2006 | Docket Event | Document Archive | |
January 11, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER SCH/PER Date: 01/11/2006 Blackstone OC: | |
December 12, 2005 | Docket Event | ORDER SCH/PER Date: 11/02/2005 Blackstone OC: HG | |
November 02, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing STATUS CHECK RE: PARENTING AGREEMENT Judge: Pomrenze, Sandra |
|
September 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing STATUS CHECK RE: PARENTING AGREEMENT SCH/PER Date: 11/02/2005 Blackstone OC: MH |
|
September 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
Return Hearing RETURN: FMC MEDIATION Judge: Pomrenze, Sandra |
|
July 08, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER SCH/PER Date: 07/08/2005 Blackstone OC: | |
July 07, 2005 | Docket Event | ORDER SCH/PER Date: 06/07/2005 Blackstone OC: HG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.