Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Stone, Vincent S, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Pro Se, against Stone, Suzzanah R, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Lueck, Robert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLueck, Robert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2000 |
CategoryDivorce - Complaint |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDivorce Granted |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Withdrawal Notice of S.C.R. 46 Withdrawal of Attorney |
|
December 18, 2009 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
December 18, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order | |
December 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Pursuant to EDCR 5.28 |
|
December 17, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
December 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order to Modify Visitation |
|
December 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Affirmation re: Stipulation and Order to Modify Visitation |
|
November 23, 2009 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order | |
October 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion for Review and Adjustment of Child Support Deft's Motion for a Three Year Child Support Review Judge: Pomrenze, Sandra |
|
October 14, 2009 | Docket Event | Financial Disclosure Form |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.