Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Funk, Valerie, Funk, Michael A, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Voy, William O presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVoy, William O Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 04, 2000 |
CategoryDivorce - Joint Petition |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judicial Elections 2014 - Case Reassignment Family Court Judicial Officer Reassignment 2014 Judge: Reassignment 2014 |
|
July 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment to Department F Reassigned from Department O |
|
July 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing Order Made On 7/6/2009 |
|
July 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Entered 6/30/2009 |
|
July 01, 2009 | Docket Event | Order | |
February 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
Return Hearing : CHILD INTERVIEW/MEDIATION OF PARENTING PLAN Judge: Sullivan, Frank P. |
|
February 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
Agreement Parenting |
|
January 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment Reassigned from Department L to Department O |
|
December 19, 2008 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Financial Condition | |
December 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rescheduling Of Hearing Return Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.