Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Judge Pro Tempore, Bradford, Lauriann, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Craig B Friedberg, against Penate, Rolando, Argueta, Walter, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Togliatti, Jennifer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTogliatti, Jennifer Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2000 |
CategoryNegligence - Auto |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment Plus Legal Interest |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment - Judicial Officer Change From Vacant DC8 to Judge Trevor L. Atkin Judge: ChangeFrom Vacant DC8 to Judge Trevor L. Atkin |
|
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 8 Judicial Reassignment to Department 8 - Vacant DC8 Judge |
|
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 9 Judicial Reassignment - From Judge Bailus to Vacant, DC9 |
|
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 18 Reassigned From Judge Jones - Dept 29 |
|
July 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 29 Civil Case Reassignment to Judge David M. Jones |
|
May 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 20 Case reassigned from Judge Jerome Tao Dept 20 |
|
January 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 20 Case reassigned from Judge Togliatti, Jennifer |
|
February 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
Judgment DEFAULT JUDGMENT PLUS LEGAL INTEREST |
|
February 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT |
|
February 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
Prove Up/Default PLTF'S PROVE UP OF DEFAULT/1 Court Clerk: Alan Castle Reporter/Recorder: Kristen Lunkwitz Heard By: Jennifer Togliatti DECLARATION OF CRAIG B. FRIEDBERG IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED IN OPEN COURT UNDER SEAL and APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT AND DECLARATION OF CRAIG B. FRIEDBERG IN SUPPORT THEREOF FILED IN OPEN COURT Lauriann Bradford sworn and testified. COURT ORDERED, petition GRANTED. JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT FILED IN OPEN COURT. COURT ORDERED, CASE CLOSED. Judge: Togliatti, Jennifer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.