Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Reed, Barbara, Poole, Timothy A, Pacific West Real Estate, Nelsen, Gregory P, Meyer, Susan, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Other Tort case represented by Joseph R Ganley, against Pelto, Matt, Houts, William A, Wah Llc, Reed, Barbara, Poole, Timothy A, (total of 8) See All represented by Dale A. Hayes, Sr., David J Rivers, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Walsh, Jessie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWalsh, Jessie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2000 |
CategoryOther Tort |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeClerk'S Certificate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 3 Case Reassignment from Judge Tierra Jones to Judge Douglas W. Herndon |
|
May 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment - Judicial Officer Change From Judge Jessie Walsh to Judge Tierra Jones Judge: ChangeFrom Judge Jessie Walsh to Judge Tierra Jones |
|
May 26, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice of Non-Applicability of Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order Granting Timothy Poole's Motion for Summary Judgment as to Defendant's Barbara Reed, Pacific West Real Estate, Remax Achievers and Gregory P. Nelsen | |
December 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
Judgment CLERK'S CERTIFICATE/JUDGMENT AFFIRMED |
|
April 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
Reporters Transcript TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS DEFENDANT POOLES MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES |
|
March 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion Case Event Type CASH BOND RECEIPT #219641 $274.00 |
|
March 27, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL (SC 47009) | |
March 27, 2006 | Docket Event | CASE APPEAL STATEMENT | |
March 09, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER | |
February 23, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.