Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Billitteri, Peter, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Robert T. Eglet, against Singel Dpm, Marcus J, Foot And Ankle Specialists Of So Nev, represented by Sherman Bennett Mayor, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Walsh, Jessie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWalsh, Jessie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2000 |
CategoryMalpractice - Medical/Dental |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 3 Case Reassignment from Judge Tierra Jones to Judge Douglas W. Herndon |
|
May 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment - Judicial Officer Change From Judge Jessie Walsh to Judge Tierra Jones Judge: ChangeFrom Judge Jessie Walsh to Judge Tierra Jones |
|
September 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Vacated Judge: Walsh, Jessie |
|
August 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call Vacated Judge: Walsh, Jessie |
|
August 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
Pre Trial Conference Vacated Judge: Walsh, Jessie |
|
March 28, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER | |
March 24, 2005 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS WITH PREJUDICE AND ORDER FOR RETURN OF JURY FEES | |
March 24, 2005 | Docket Event |
Judgment ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
March 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Vacated Judge: Walsh, Jessie |
|
March 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call Vacated Judge: Walsh, Jessie |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.