Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Sugganth Daniel, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
|
PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY DANIEL, SUGGANTH ON 09/07/2021
Date: September 07, 2021CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DANIEL, SUGGANTH ON 09/07/2021
Date: September 07, 2021NAME CHANGE NOTICE OF RELATED CASES FILED BY DANIEL, SUGGANTH ON 09/07/2021
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY DANIEL, SUGGANTH ON 09/07/2021
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00DECREE CHANGING NAME RECEIVED ON 09/07/2021.
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME 10/27/2021 08:30:00 AM.
Date: October 27, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE BY PUBLICATION FILED BY DANIEL, SUGGANTH ON 10/01/2021
Date: October 01, 2021DECREE CHANGING NAME FILED BY DANIEL, SUGGANTH ON 10/27/2021
Date: October 27, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.