Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Cavalry Spv I, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Dale D Munger, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Melissa R. McCormick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMelissa R. McCormick Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryOther Collections |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 12/01/2021
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 09/28/2021
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 09/02/2021
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 12/01/2021
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 12/01/2021.
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: December 06, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 09/02/2021
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 12/02/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 12/01/2021
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 10/12/2021 01:19:00 PM.
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/01/2021
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER (ACCEPT COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS) FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 12/01/2021
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER (VENUE) FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 09/02/2021
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 12/01/2021
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00JUDGMENT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 12/06/2021
Date: December 06, 2021CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/03/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 09/02/2021
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21098035 REJECTED.
Date: December 13, 2021E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21094995 REJECTED.
Date: December 07, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.