Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Watkins & Letofsky, Llp, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Dirk Widmann, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WATKINS & LETOFSKY, LLP ON 09/02/2021
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WATKINS & LETOFSKY, LLP ON 09/02/2021
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY WATKINS & LETOFSKY, LLP ON 10/05/2021
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY WATKINS & LETOFSKY, LLP ON 09/02/2021
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/17/2022 09:22:00 AM.
Date: June 17, 2022STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/06/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OC GENERATED
Date: July 18, 2022CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: June 20, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL - PETITION FILED BY WATKINS & LETOFSKY, LLP ON 12/16/2021
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 05/06/2022 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-05-06T00:00:00REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY WATKINS & LETOFSKY, LLP ON 12/15/2021
Date: 2021-12-15T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY WATKINS & LETOFSKY, LLP ON 05/05/2022
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY WATKINS & LETOFSKY, LLP ON 06/28/2022
Date: June 28, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.