Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Pick Real Estate, Lp, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Mays Incorporated, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Robert F. Kohler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert F. Kohler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Commercial |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
COMPLAINT FILED BY PICK REAL ESTATE, LP ON 09/02/2021
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00DOCUMENT - OTHER (PLAINTIFF'S MANDATORY COVER SHEET) FILED BY PICK REAL ESTATE, LP ON 09/02/2021
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PICK REAL ESTATE, LP ON 09/02/2021
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY MAYS INCORPORATED ON 09/13/2021
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PICK REAL ESTATE, LP ON 09/02/2021
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00MOTION TO STRIKE FILED BY PICK REAL ESTATE, LP ON 10/12/2021
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY PICK REAL ESTATE, LP ON 09/27/2021
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1899024 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PICK REAL ESTATE, LP ON 12/01/2021
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21095023 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00STATEMENT OF CASE FILED BY PICK REAL ESTATE, LP ON 12/02/2021
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 11/04/2021 08:22:00 AM.
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY MAYS INCORPORATED ON 10/21/2021
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00CASE REASSIGNED TO ROBERT KOHLER EFFECTIVE 10/04/2021.
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY MAYS INCORPORATED ON 11/08/2021
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY PICK REAL ESTATE, LP ON 12/02/2021
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00WITNESS LIST FILED BY PICK REAL ESTATE, LP ON 12/02/2021
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER 10/22/2021 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00JURY INSTRUCTIONS FILED BY PICK REAL ESTATE, LP ON 12/02/2021
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY MAYS INCORPORATED ON 11/08/2021
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 11/03/2021 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY PICK REAL ESTATE, LP ON 01/24/2022
Date: January 24, 2022WRIT (OF POSSESSION AS TO ORANGE COUNTY) ISSUED ON 12/13/2021
Date: December 13, 2021PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/06/2021
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PICK REAL ESTATE, LP ON 12/06/2021
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41272108 REJECTED.
Date: December 07, 2021EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY PICK REAL ESTATE, LP ON 12/02/2021
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 12/06/2021 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21108582 REJECTED.
Date: January 18, 2022APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PICK REAL ESTATE, LP ON 12/10/2021
Date: December 10, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.