Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Nancy Moran, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Corey Scott Cramin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCorey Scott Cramin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 09/02/2021
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 09/02/2021
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 12/17/2021
Date: December 17, 2021PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 09/17/2021
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER (RE: VENUE) FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 09/02/2021
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 12/17/2021
Date: December 17, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 09/02/2021
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 12/17/2021
Date: December 17, 2021DECLARATION - OTHER (RE: B&P 6322.1) FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 09/02/2021
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.