Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Jasmine Gomez, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Theodore R. Howard presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTheodore R. Howard Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryOther Collections |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 02/08/2022
Date: 2022-02-08T00:00:00NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT CHANGE
Date: February 23, 2023CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/04/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR 03/08/2022 03:00:00 PM.
Date: March 08, 2022MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 02/04/2022 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 09/02/2021
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 10/12/2021
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 09/22/2021
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: March 08, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 09/02/2021
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 02/18/2022 09:00:00 AM.
Date: March 09, 2022COMPLAINT FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 09/02/2021
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.