Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ford Motor Credit Company Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Jesus Salas, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC ON 10/12/2021
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC ON 09/02/2021
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC ON 10/27/2022
Date: October 27, 2022COMPLAINT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC ON 09/02/2021
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC ON 10/27/2022
Date: October 27, 2022CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC ON 09/02/2021
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 10/27/2022.
Date: 2022-10-27T00:00:00ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED ON 02/08/2023
Date: February 08, 2023CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: November 03, 2022JUDGMENT FILED BY FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC ON 10/31/2022
Date: October 31, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.