Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Rachel Hughes, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
COMPLAINT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK ON 09/02/2021
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK ON 09/02/2021
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK ON 11/14/2022
Date: 2022-11-14T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK ON 12/29/2022
Date: December 29, 2022JUDGMENT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK ON 12/30/2022
Date: December 30, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK ON 09/02/2021
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00WRIT (LOS ANGELES) ISSUED ON 05/20/2023
Date: May 20, 2023PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK ON 10/06/2021
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK ON 12/29/2022
Date: December 29, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.