Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Citibank, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Salvador Guerrero, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Corey Scott Cramin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCorey Scott Cramin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CITIBANK, N.A. ON 11/03/2021
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY CITIBANK, N.A. ON 09/02/2021
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CITIBANK, N.A. ON 09/02/2021
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CITIBANK, N.A. ON 09/02/2021
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GUERRERO, SALVADOR ON 10/14/2021
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/03/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00ANSWER (GENERAL DENIAL) FILED BY GUERRERO, SALVADOR ON 09/30/2021
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY CITIBANK, N.A. ON 10/20/2021
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 12/03/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00MOTION - OTHER (MOTION TO RESET CASE) FILED BY CITIBANK, N.A. ON 03/09/2023
Date: March 09, 2023MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 02/07/2023 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2023-02-08T00:00:00NOTICE OF TRIAL FILED BY CITIBANK, N.A. ON 12/14/2022
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/09/2023.
Date: March 09, 2023MINUTES FINALIZED FOR 02/02/2023 03:18:00 PM.
Date: 2023-02-02T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY CITIBANK, N.A. ON 02/10/2023
Date: 2023-02-10T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 11/08/2022 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-11-08T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.