Lvnv Funding Llc,
filed a(n)
Collections -
Creditor
case
against
Melisa Hernandez,
in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
This case was filed in
Orange County
Superior Courts
.
Case Details for
Lvnv Funding Llc v. Melisa Hernandez
Case Events for
Lvnv Funding Llc v. Melisa Hernandez
Date
Type
Description
April 13, 2022
Docket Event
E-FILING TRANSACTION 31142779 RECEIVED ON 04/11/2022 02:58:34 PM.
April 11, 2022
Docket Event
CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL
April 11, 2022
Docket Event
COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.
April 11, 2022
Docket Event
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 04/11/2022
September 20, 2021
Docket Event
PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 09/20/2021
September 20, 2021
Docket Event
E-FILING TRANSACTION 1895960 RECEIVED ON 09/20/2021 08:39:13 AM.
September 03, 2021
Docket Event
PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12938666 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12766565.
September 03, 2021
Docket Event
E-FILING TRANSACTION 41235972 RECEIVED ON 09/02/2021 07:19:30 AM.
September 02, 2021
Docket Event
SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 09/02/2021