Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Uhg I Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Meredith Medeiros, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Lon F. Hurwitz presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLon F. Hurwitz Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryOther Collections |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
COMPLAINT FILED BY UHG I LLC ON 09/02/2021
Date: September 02, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY UHG I LLC ON 09/02/2021
Date: September 02, 2021CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY UHG I LLC ON 09/02/2021
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY UHG I LLC ON 09/02/2021
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 01/31/2022 09:00:00 AM.
Date: January 31, 2022CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/31/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: January 31, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.