Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Td Bank Usa, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against C Moght Aderi, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2021 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A. ON 09/01/2021
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A. ON 01/28/2022
Date: January 28, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A. ON 09/01/2021
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A. ON 01/28/2022
Date: January 28, 2022COMPLAINT FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A. ON 09/01/2021
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED ON 07/11/2022
Date: July 11, 2022REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A. ON 01/28/2022
Date: January 28, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A. ON 11/08/2021
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00JUDGMENT FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A. ON 01/28/2022
Date: January 28, 2022DECLARATION - OTHER (RE: VENUE) FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A. ON 09/01/2021
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.