Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Kevin Kaveh Nayyeri, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
|
PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY NAYYERI, KEVIN KAVEH ON 09/02/2021
Date: September 02, 2021DECREE CHANGING NAME FILED BY NAYYERI, KEVIN KAVEH ON 11/03/2021
Date: November 03, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE BY PUBLICATION FILED BY NAYYERI, KEVIN KAVEH ON 09/30/2021
Date: September 30, 2021NAME CHANGE NOTICE OF RELATED CASES FILED BY NAYYERI, KEVIN KAVEH ON 09/02/2021
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME 11/03/2021 08:30:00 AM.
Date: November 03, 2021DECREE CHANGING NAME RECEIVED ON 09/02/2021.
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY NAYYERI, KEVIN KAVEH ON 09/02/2021
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY NAYYERI, KEVIN KAVEH ON 09/02/2021
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.