Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Josef Ietn, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against General Motors Llc, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Melissa R. McCormick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMelissa R. McCormick Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/09/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00NOTICE OF ERRATA FILED BY IETN, JOSEF ON 07/02/2021
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY IETN, JOSEF ON 06/30/2021
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY GENERAL MOTORS LLC ON 08/06/2021
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY IETN, JOSEF ON 07/02/2021
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY IETN, JOSEF ON 06/30/2021
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GENERAL MOTORS LLC ON 11/24/2021
Date: November 24, 2021CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY IETN, JOSEF ON 11/24/2021
Date: November 24, 2021MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 12/09/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Date: December 09, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.