Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ricardo Martinez, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Copeland, A., Copeland, Adam, County Of Orange, County Of Orange, A California Public, Deleo, F., (total of 15) See All in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Nathan T. Vu presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNathan T. Vu Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryNon-Pi/Pd/Wd Tort - Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/21/2021
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/03/2021 AT 09:30:00 AM IN N17 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO 170.6 CCP (HON. CRAIG GRIFFIN) FILED BY COUNTY OF ORANGE ON 09/21/2021
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER (170.6 HON. CRAIG GRIFFIN) FILED BY COUNTY OF ORANGE ON 09/21/2021
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2022-05-04T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/27/2021 11:11:00 AM.
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY COUNTY OF ORANGE ON 10/28/2021
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY COUNTY OF ORANGE ON 10/22/2021
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/18/2021
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00NOTICE OF HEARING OC GENERATED
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MARTINEZ, RICARDO ON 11/29/2021
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00NOTICE OF TRIAL FILED BY MARTINEZ, RICARDO ON 06/14/2022
Date: 2022-06-14T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/06/2023
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/22/2021
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/27/2021 11:44:00 AM.
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER (DENIED) FILED BY COUNTY OF ORANGE ON 12/27/2021
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 1) FILED BY MARTINEZ, RICARDO ON 12/21/2022
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY MARTINEZ, RICARDO ON 02/21/2023
Date: 2023-02-21T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS 01/31/2022 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/02/2022 02:31:00 PM.
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/27/2022
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER (COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE) FILED BY COUNTY OF ORANGE ON 04/19/2023
Date: 2023-04-19T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/04/2022 10:08:00 AM.
Date: 2022-05-04T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY SUSAN ORELLANA ON 05/17/2022
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT CHANGE
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY MARTINEZ, RICARDO ON 06/06/2022
Date: 2022-06-06T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT ON 06/28/2023
Date: 2023-06-28T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/22/2023
Date: 2023-06-22T00:00:00NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY MARTINEZ, RICARDO ON 03/06/2023
Date: 2023-03-06T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER (REQUEST FOR REFUND - GRANTED) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/07/2022
Date: 2022-06-07T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2022-06-15T00:00:00JOINT STATEMENT FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT ON 05/11/2023
Date: 2023-05-11T00:00:00CASE REASSIGNED TO NATHAN VU EFFECTIVE 08/15/2022.
Date: 2022-07-29T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 06/13/2022 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-06-13T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY COUNTY OF ORANGE ON 01/30/2023
Date: 2023-01-30T00:00:00MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FILED BY MARTINEZ, RICARDO ON 02/21/2023
Date: 2023-02-21T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY COUNTY OF ORANGE ON 04/19/2023
Date: 2023-04-19T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/22/2023
Date: 2023-03-22T00:00:00SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY MARTINEZ, RICARDO ON 09/11/2023
Date: September 11, 2023SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY COUNTY OF ORANGE ON 04/19/2023
Date: 2023-04-19T00:00:00NOTICE OF ERRATA FILED BY COUNTY OF ORANGE ON 04/19/2023
Date: 2023-04-19T00:00:00MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION FILED BY COUNTY OF ORANGE ON 04/19/2023
Date: 2023-04-19T00:00:00STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY MARTINEZ, RICARDO ON 07/06/2023
Date: 2023-07-06T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT ON 04/25/2023
Date: 2023-04-25T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY MARTINEZ, RICARDO ON 04/27/2023
Date: 2023-04-27T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 04/27/2023 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2023-04-28T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MISCELLANEOUS HEARING 05/23/2023 11:00:00 AM.
Date: 2023-05-23T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2023-05-23T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR UNDER SUBMISSION RULING 2023-05-16 10:19:00.0.
Date: 2023-05-16T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/07/2023 02:51:00 PM.
Date: 2023-06-07T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY COUNTY OF ORANGE ON 04/28/2023
Date: 2023-04-28T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/11/2023 04:30:00 PM.
Date: 2023-05-11T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2023-05-16T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2023-06-07T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR DISCOVERY 05/08/2023 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2023-05-09T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/22/2023 08:56:00 AM.
Date: 2023-05-23T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MISCELLANEOUS HEARING 06/12/2023 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2023-06-13T00:00:00STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO ADVANCE MOTION FOR DISCOVERY) FILED BY MARTINEZ, RICARDO ON 04/21/2023
Date: 2023-04-21T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2023-04-28T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR DISCOVERY 05/26/2023 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2023-05-30T00:00:00REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY MARTINEZ, RICARDO ON 05/01/2023
Date: 2023-05-01T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY MARTINEZ, RICARDO ON 09/11/2023
Date: September 11, 2023EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY MARTINEZ, RICARDO ON 09/11/2023
Date: September 11, 2023PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/11/2023
Date: 2023-09-11T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY MARTINEZ, RICARDO ON 09/11/2023
Date: 2023-09-11T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY MARTINEZ, RICARDO ON 09/11/2023
Date: 2023-09-11T00:00:00OBJECTION FILED BY MARTINEZ, RICARDO ON 09/11/2023
Date: 2023-09-11T00:00:00NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY MARTINEZ, RICARDO ON 12/10/2021
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY COUNTY OF ORANGE ON 12/13/2021
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 12/13/2021 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MARTINEZ, RICARDO ON 06/30/2021
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY MARTINEZ, RICARDO ON 06/30/2021
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MARTINEZ, RICARDO ON 06/30/2021
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.