Td Bank Usa, N.A.,
filed a(n)
Collections -
Creditor
case
against
Priscilla Park,
in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
This case was filed in
Orange County
Superior Courts
with Corey Scott Cramin presiding.
Case Details for
Td Bank Usa, N.A. v. Priscilla Park
Case Events for
Td Bank Usa, N.A. v. Priscilla Park
Date
Type
Description
February 28, 2023
Docket Event
E-FILING TRANSACTION 31275590 RECEIVED ON 02/28/2023 01:44:10 PM.
February 28, 2023
Docket Event
COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.
February 28, 2023
Docket Event
CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL
February 28, 2023
Docket Event
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A. ON 02/28/2023
February 15, 2023
Docket Event
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL/$500 SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE/NON-COMPLIANCE WITH CRC 3.740(E) SCHEDULED FOR 03/17/2023 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Corey Scott Cramin
February 15, 2023
Docket Event
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL/$500 MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN ONE YEAR/NON-COMPLIANCE WITH CRC 3.740(F) SCHEDULED FOR 03/17/2023 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Corey Scott Cramin
July 01, 2021
Docket Event
E-FILING TRANSACTION 1865206 RECEIVED ON 06/30/2021 01:27:17 PM.
July 01, 2021
Docket Event
PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12907114 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12734953.
June 30, 2021
Docket Event
COMPLAINT FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A. ON 06/30/2021
June 30, 2021
Docket Event
CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A. ON 06/30/2021