American Express National Bank,
filed a(n)
Collections -
Creditor
case
against
Luka Tukvadze,
in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
This case was filed in
Orange County
Superior Courts
.
Case Details for
American Express National Bank v. Luka Tukvadze
Case Events for
American Express National Bank v. Luka Tukvadze
Date
Type
Description
July 20, 2021
Docket Event
COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.
July 20, 2021
Docket Event
CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL
July 20, 2021
Docket Event
E-FILING TRANSACTION 31040657 RECEIVED ON 07/20/2021 09:51:00 AM.
July 20, 2021
Docket Event
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK ON 07/20/2021
July 01, 2021
Docket Event
E-FILING TRANSACTION 21036351 RECEIVED ON 06/30/2021 12:58:25 PM.
July 01, 2021
Docket Event
PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12907087 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12734926.
June 30, 2021
Docket Event
CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK ON 06/30/2021
June 30, 2021
Docket Event
SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK ON 06/30/2021
June 30, 2021
Docket Event
COMPLAINT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK ON 06/30/2021