Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Armando Ceron, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Corey Scott Cramin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCorey Scott Cramin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY CERON, ARMANDO ON 07/12/2021
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/20/2021 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK ON 06/30/2021
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK ON 07/06/2021
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK ON 07/06/2021
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK ON 06/30/2021
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CERON, ARMANDO ON 07/12/2021
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK ON 07/02/2021
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK ON 07/02/2021
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK ON 06/30/2021
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: April 22, 2022PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/13/2022.
Date: April 13, 2022MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK ON 03/10/2022
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 03/10/2022.
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK ON 03/10/2022
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK ON 03/10/2022
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER (EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT) FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK ON 03/10/2022
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY CERON, ARMANDO ON 10/20/2021
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK ON 03/10/2022
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 10/20/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/10/2022.
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.