Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Autovest Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Oscar Penaloza, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY AUTOVEST LLC ON 07/07/2021
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY AUTOVEST LLC ON 04/04/2022
Date: 2022-04-04T00:00:00NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY AUTOVEST LLC ON 11/15/2021
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY AUTOVEST LLC ON 06/30/2021
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21142224 REJECTED.
Date: April 06, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY AUTOVEST LLC ON 06/30/2021
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY AUTOVEST LLC ON 06/30/2021
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY AUTOVEST LLC ON 04/26/2022
Date: April 26, 2022JUDGMENT FILED BY AUTOVEST LLC ON 04/26/2022
Date: April 26, 2022REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY AUTOVEST LLC ON 04/26/2022
Date: April 26, 2022DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY AUTOVEST LLC ON 04/26/2022
Date: April 26, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.