Td Bank Usa, N.A.,
filed a(n)
Collections -
Creditor
case
against
Sonia Serrano,
in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
This case was filed in
Orange County
Superior Courts
with Corey Scott Cramin presiding.
Case Details for
Td Bank Usa, N.A. v. Sonia Serrano
Case Events for
Td Bank Usa, N.A. v. Sonia Serrano
Date
Type
Description
February 28, 2023
Docket Event
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A. ON 02/28/2023
February 28, 2023
Docket Event
COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.
February 28, 2023
Docket Event
E-FILING TRANSACTION 41453742 RECEIVED ON 02/28/2023 10:53:35 AM.
February 28, 2023
Docket Event
CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL
February 14, 2023
Docket Event
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL/$500 SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE/NON-COMPLIANCE WITH CRC 3.740(E) SCHEDULED FOR 03/14/2023 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Corey Scott Cramin
February 14, 2023
Docket Event
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL/$500 MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN ONE YEAR/NON-COMPLIANCE WITH CRC 3.740(F) SCHEDULED FOR 03/14/2023 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Corey Scott Cramin
June 30, 2021
Docket Event
E-FILING TRANSACTION 41210766 RECEIVED ON 06/29/2021 10:01:48 AM.
June 30, 2021
Docket Event
PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12906368 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12734187.
June 29, 2021
Docket Event
DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A. ON 06/29/2021
June 29, 2021
Docket Event
COMPLAINT FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A. ON 06/29/2021