Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cavalry Spv I, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Ovsanna Magdesyan, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Corey Scott Cramin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCorey Scott Cramin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 08, 2021 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 11/10/2022
Date: November 10, 2022CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 04/08/2021
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 04/13/2021
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 12/06/2022 01:30:00 PM.
Date: December 06, 2022DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 04/08/2021
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 04/08/2021
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 04/08/2021
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 12/12/2022
Date: December 12, 2022MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 01/10/2023 01:30:00 PM.
Date: January 10, 2023For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.