Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Nathan R. Scott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNathan R. Scott Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 08, 2021 |
CategoryWrongful Termination |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HEINEMAN, NOLAN ON 04/08/2021
Date: April 08, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HEINEMAN, NOLAN ON 04/08/2021
Date: April 08, 2021COMPLAINT FILED BY HEINEMAN, NOLAN ON 04/08/2021
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY HEINEMAN, NOLAN ON 04/19/2021
Date: April 19, 2021CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: April 12, 2021ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 04/08/2021.
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.