Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Jacqueline Skaggs, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 07, 2021 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 04/19/2021
Date: April 19, 2021DECLARATION - OTHER (B&P) FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 04/07/2021
Date: April 07, 2021DECLARATION - OTHER (VENUE) FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 04/07/2021
Date: April 07, 2021COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 04/07/2021
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 04/07/2021
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 04/07/2021
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.