Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Edgar E Mendez, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 07, 2021 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ON 04/07/2021
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ON 04/07/2021
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ON 06/15/2021
Date: June 15, 2021COMPLAINT FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ON 04/07/2021
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ON 06/21/2021
Date: June 21, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.