Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cavalry Spv I, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Ashley Wright, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 07, 2021 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
DECLARATION - OTHER (RE: B&P 6322.1) FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 04/07/2021
Date: April 07, 2021DECLARATION - OTHER (RE: VENUE) FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 04/07/2021
Date: April 07, 2021PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 05/10/2021
Date: May 10, 2021CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 04/07/2021
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 04/07/2021
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 04/07/2021
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.