Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Ronald J Lopez, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 07, 2021 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ON 07/06/2021
Date: July 06, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ON 04/07/2021
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00JUDGMENT FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ON 07/06/2021
Date: July 06, 2021ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED ON 09/10/2021
Date: September 10, 2021PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ON 05/14/2021
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ON 04/07/2021
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ON 04/07/2021
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.