Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Michael L Carter, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 07, 2021 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ON 04/07/2021
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ON 04/07/2021
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ON 04/07/2021
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00STATEMENT - OTHER FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ON 05/09/2022
Date: May 09, 2022PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ON 04/13/2021
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ON 09/28/2021
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00JUDGMENT FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ON 05/09/2022
Date: May 09, 2022PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ON 03/24/2022
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ON 09/28/2021
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.