Bank Of America, N.A.,
filed a(n)
Collections -
Creditor
case
against
Marcos F Cruz,
in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
This case was filed in
Orange County
Superior Courts
.
Case Details for
Bank Of America, N.A. v. Marcos F Cruz
Case Events for
Bank Of America, N.A. v. Marcos F Cruz
Date
Type
Description
February 04, 2022
Docket Event
E-FILING TRANSACTION 31116080 RECEIVED ON 02/03/2022 03:16:00 PM.
February 03, 2022
Docket Event
COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.
February 03, 2022
Docket Event
CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL
February 03, 2022
Docket Event
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 02/03/2022
April 08, 2021
Docket Event
E-FILING TRANSACTION 31000595 RECEIVED ON 04/07/2021 07:53:14 AM.
April 08, 2021
Docket Event
PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12870157 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12697816.
April 07, 2021
Docket Event
COMPLAINT FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 04/07/2021
April 07, 2021
Docket Event
SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 04/07/2021
April 07, 2021
Docket Event
CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. ON 04/07/2021