Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cavalry Spv I, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Virginia Lopez, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 08, 2021 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
DECLARATION - OTHER (WAIVER OF INTEREST IN EXCESS OF 10%) FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 08/30/2021
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED ON 04/07/2022
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00WRIT (AS TO SAN DIEGO COUNTY) ISSUED ON 08/04/2023
Date: August 04, 2023WRIT (LOS ANGELES) ISSUED ON 04/26/2022
Date: April 26, 2022PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 04/22/2021
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 04/08/2021
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (RE: CCP 1788.60(A)) FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 08/30/2021
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 04/08/2021
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 08/30/2021
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 04/08/2021
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER (WAIVER OF SECURITY INTEREST) FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 08/30/2021
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 04/08/2021
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 08/30/2021
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00JUDGMENT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 08/31/2021
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 12/01/2022
Date: December 01, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.