Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Roberto G Sandoval, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 06, 2021 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
JUDGMENT FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ON 06/18/2021
Date: June 18, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ON 04/06/2021
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ON 04/06/2021
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00STATEMENT - OTHER FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ON 05/27/2021
Date: May 27, 2021PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ON 04/13/2021
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ON 05/27/2021
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ON 04/06/2021
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED ON 09/03/2021
Date: September 03, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.