Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
My Ai Doan, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 07, 2021 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
|
DECREE CHANGING NAME FILED BY DOAN, MY AI ON 06/02/2021
Date: June 02, 2021PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY DOAN, MY AI ON 04/07/2021
Date: April 07, 2021DECREE CHANGING NAME RECEIVED ON 04/07/2021.
Date: April 07, 2021CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DOAN, MY AI ON 04/07/2021
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE BY PUBLICATION FILED BY DOAN, MY AI ON 05/25/2021
Date: May 25, 2021NAME CHANGE NOTICE OF RELATED CASES FILED BY DOAN, MY AI ON 04/07/2021
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY DOAN, MY AI ON 04/07/2021
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.