Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Chul Kim, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Todd Jared Brown, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with James L. Crandall presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames L. Crandall Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 08, 2020 |
CategoryPi/Pd/Wd - Auto |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KIM, CHUL ON 06/08/2020
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY KIM, CHUL ON 06/08/2020
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY KIM, CHUL ON 01/07/2021
Date: January 07, 2021CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CRANDALL, JAMES ON 06/08/2020.
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KIM, CHUL ON 06/08/2020
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 04/25/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: January 06, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.