Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Miave, Llc, filed a(n) Civil case against Pitechplus, Srl, Razvan Costin, Tibueriu Dascal, Alexandra Crecan, Oana Chifu, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 29, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 07, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2022 | Hearing |
Jury trial
Judge: CRANDALL |
|
March 04, 2022 | Hearing |
Mandatory settlement conference
Judge: CRANDALL |
|
March 09, 2021 | Hearing |
Order to show cause re: failure to comply re:crc 3.110b
Judge: CRANDALL |
|
January 06, 2021 | Action | Order to show cause re: failure to comply re:crc 3.110b scheduled for 03/09/2021 at 09:00:00 am in c33 at central justice center. | |
January 06, 2021 | Action | Order to show cause re: failure to comply re:crc 3.110b continued to 03/09/2021 at 09:00 am in this department pursuant to party's motion. | |
January 06, 2021 | Action | Minutes finalized for order to show cause re: failure to comply re:crc 3.110b 01/06/2021 09:00:00 am. | |
October 22, 2020 | Action | Order to show cause re: failure to comply re:crc 3.110b scheduled for 01/06/2021 at 09:00:00 am in c33 at central justice center. | |
August 21, 2020 | Action | Mandatory settlement conference scheduled for 03/04/2022 at 09:00:00 am in c33 at central justice center. | |
August 21, 2020 | Action | Jury trial scheduled for 04/04/2022 at 09:00:00 am in c33 at central justice center. | |
July 06, 2020 | Action | E-filing transaction 1742547 received on 05/29/2020 08:22:29 am. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.