Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Tuasivi Scanlan, filed a(n) Civil case against Daniel Gordon Borthwick, Thuy Borthwick, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 26, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 07, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2021 | Hearing |
Trial setting conference
Judge: HOFFER |
|
February 09, 2021 | Hearing |
Order to show cause re: sanctions/dismissal
Judge: HOFFER |
|
January 06, 2021 | Action | Trial setting conference scheduled for 02/09/2021 at 09:00:00 am in c42 at central justice center. | |
January 06, 2021 | Action | Order to show cause re: sanctions/dismissal scheduled for 02/09/2021 at 09:00:00 am in c42 at central justice center. | |
January 06, 2021 | Action | Trial setting conference continued to 02/09/2021 at 09:00 am in this department pursuant to court's motion. | |
January 06, 2021 | Action | The order to show cause re: sanctions/dismissal is scheduled for 02/09/2021 at 09:00 am in department c-42. | |
January 06, 2021 | Action | Minutes finalized for trial setting conference 01/06/2021 09:00:00 am. | |
January 06, 2021 | Action | Clerk's certificate of mailing/electronic service | |
November 17, 2020 | Action | E-filing transaction 1787212 received on 11/16/2020 11:04:19 pm. | |
November 17, 2020 | Action | Trial setting conference scheduled for 01/06/2021 at 09:00:00 am in c42 at central justice center. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.