Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Crown Asset Management, Llc, filed a(n) Civil case against Claudio Ruiz, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 11, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 07, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2021 | Action | Complaint (b&p 6322.1) disposed with disposition of court-ordered dismissal. | |
January 06, 2021 | Action | Case dismissed with disposition of court-ordered dismissal | |
January 06, 2021 | Action | Court orders the entire action dismissed without prejudice. | |
January 06, 2021 | Action | Minutes finalized for order to show cause re: dismissal 01/06/2021 01:30:00 pm. | |
January 06, 2021 | Action | Notice of dismissal oc generated | |
October 21, 2020 | Action | Order to show cause re: dismissal scheduled for 01/06/2021 at 01:30:00 pm in c03 at central justice center. | |
October 21, 2020 | Action | The order to show cause re: dismissal is scheduled for 01/06/2021 at 01:30 pm in department c03. | |
October 21, 2020 | Action | Minutes finalized for status conference 10/21/2020 01:30:00 pm. | |
October 21, 2020 | Action | Clerk's certificate of service by mail oc generated | |
June 22, 2020 | Action | E-filing transaction 1738166 received on 04/22/2020 06:27:50 pm. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.