Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
One Stop Eviction Collections, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Apex Recyling, Inc., Southern California Plastics, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Corey Scott Cramin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCorey Scott Cramin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 27, 2020 |
CategoryOther Collections |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/21/2020 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2020-06-16T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY ONE STOP EVICTION COLLECTIONS, LLC ON 02/27/2020
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ONE STOP EVICTION COLLECTIONS, LLC ON 04/01/2020
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 1) FILED BY ONE STOP EVICTION COLLECTIONS, LLC ON 08/13/2020
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ONE STOP EVICTION COLLECTIONS, LLC ON 03/05/2020
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ONE STOP EVICTION COLLECTIONS, LLC ON 03/05/2020
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ONE STOP EVICTION COLLECTIONS, LLC ON 02/08/2021
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY ONE STOP EVICTION COLLECTIONS, LLC ON 09/25/2020
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21008497 REJECTED.
Date: April 20, 2021JUDGMENT FILED BY ONE STOP EVICTION COLLECTIONS, LLC ON 04/20/2021
Date: April 20, 2021CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 01/06/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 10/21/2020 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1829968 REJECTED.
Date: April 01, 2021MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 02/03/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ONE STOP EVICTION COLLECTIONS, LLC ON 02/01/2021
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.