Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jose Quezada-Sanchez, filed a(n) Civil case against Halkat, Inc., Securenet Protection Services, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 24, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 07, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2021 | Hearing |
Status conference
Judge: SANDERS |
|
December 29, 2020 | Action | E-filing transaction 1798711 received on 12/29/2020 04:02:27 pm. | |
December 29, 2020 | Action | Status conference statement filed by quezada-sanchez, jose on 12/29/2020 | |
October 20, 2020 | Action | E-filing transaction 1778812 received on 10/19/2020 03:36:33 pm. | |
October 19, 2020 | Action | Substitution of attorney filed by halkat, inc. on 10/19/2020 | |
September 30, 2020 | Action | Status conference scheduled for 01/06/2021 at 01:30:00 pm in cx101 at civil complex center. | |
September 30, 2020 | Action | The status conference is reset to 01/06/2021 at 01:30 pm in this department. | |
September 30, 2020 | Action | Minutes finalized for status conference 09/30/2020 01:30:00 pm. | |
September 30, 2020 | Action | Clerk's certificate of mailing/electronic service | |
September 24, 2020 | Action | E-filing transaction 1771172 received on 09/24/2020 09:36:51 am. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.