Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Brandon Burkhart, Canop Holdings, Inc., Route Four Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Amberlee Rails, Athena Products, Inc., Brandon Burkhart, Canop Holdings, Inc., Hawthorne Hydroponics, Llc, (total of 13) See All in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with James L. Crandall presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames L. Crandall Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 03, 2020 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 03/06/2020 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00OPPOSITION (TO EX PARTE) FILED BY RAILS, AMBERLEE; BURKHART, BRANDON; CANOP HOLDINGS, INC. ON 03/06/2020
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY RAILS, AMBERLEE; BURKHART, BRANDON; CANOP HOLDINGS, INC. ON 03/06/2020
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY RAILS, AMBERLEE; BURKHART, BRANDON; CANOP HOLDINGS, INC. ON 03/06/2020
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00ORDER - OTHER FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 03/06/2020
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 03/09/2020 02:15:00 PM.
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY RAILS, AMBERLEE; BURKHART, BRANDON; CANOP HOLDINGS, INC. ON 03/13/2020
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/13/2020
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 03/16/2020
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00OBJECTION FILED BY RAILS, AMBERLEE; BURKHART, BRANDON; CANOP HOLDINGS, INC. ON 03/13/2020
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 03/17/2020 11:14:00 AM.
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00REPLY - OTHER FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 05/26/2020
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 05/26/2020
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 05/26/2020
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00RESPONSE FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 05/26/2020
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY BURKHART, BRANDON; CANOP HOLDINGS, INC. ON 06/09/2020
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00NOTICE OF ERRATA FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 05/26/2020
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY BURKHART, BRANDON; CANOP HOLDINGS, INC. ON 06/09/2020
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA FILED BY BURKHART, BRANDON; CANOP HOLDINGS, INC. ON 06/09/2020
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41085435 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (OF SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM) FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 06/22/2020
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00SUPPLEMENTAL (MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT) FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 06/22/2020
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY BURKHART, BRANDON ON 06/24/2020
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY BURKHART, BRANDON ON 06/24/2020
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00RESPONSE FILED BY BURKHART, BRANDON ON 06/24/2020
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/24/2020
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00OBJECTION FILED BY BURKHART, BRANDON ON 06/24/2020
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FILED BY BURKHART, BRANDON ON 06/25/2020
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED ON 06/24/2020
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION 06/25/2020 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/06/2020 11:18:00 AM.
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41077475 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41093491 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY BURKHART, BRANDON ON 06/26/2020
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 11/08/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3920842 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41099245 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00RESPONSE FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 07/21/2020
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REPLY FILED BY BURKHART, BRANDON ON 07/23/2020
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY BURKHART, BRANDON ON 07/23/2020
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 07/21/2020
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 07/29/2020
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY BURKHART, BRANDON ON 08/11/2020
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/26/2020
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO QUASH DISCOVERY SUBPOENA 07/30/2020 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY BURKHART, BRANDON ON 02/06/2020
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/26/2020 11:19:00 AM.
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00CASE CONSOLIDATED ON 08/26/2020. 30-2020-01129185-CU-BC-CJC IS DESIGNATED THE LEAD CASE.
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY BURKHART, BRANDON ON 02/19/2020
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/26/2020 02:15:00 PM.
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 08/26/2020
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY BURKHART, BRANDON ON 09/10/2020
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 08/28/2020
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00REPLY TO MOTION FILED BY PIERCE, JUSTIN; ALSTON, KENNETH; ROUTE FOUR, LLC ON 09/17/2020
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY PIERCE, JUSTIN; ALSTON, KENNETH; ROUTE FOUR, LLC ON 09/17/2020
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00OBJECTION FILED BY PIERCE, JUSTIN; ALSTON, KENNETH; ROUTE FOUR, LLC ON 09/17/2020
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00REPLY - OTHER FILED BY BURKHART, BRANDON ON 09/21/2020
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY BURKHART, BRANDON ON 09/21/2020
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 10/15/2020 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00AMENDED COMPLAINT (SECOND) FILED BY BURKHART, BRANDON ON 09/24/2020
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/15/2020
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 09/24/2020 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY BURKHART, BRANDON ON 10/21/2020
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3949165 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 10/20/2020
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY ROUTE FOUR, LLC; ALSTON, KENNETH; PIERCE, JUSTIN ON 10/27/2020
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY BURKHART, BRANDON ON 11/09/2020
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 10/15/2020
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/15/2020.
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE 01/06/2021 09:30:00 AM.
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/05/2021 11:56:00 AM.
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/22/2020
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY BURKHART, BRANDON ON 01/05/2021
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 04/01/2021
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1830098 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/01/2021
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY RAILS, AMBERLEE; BURKHART, BRANDON; CANOP HOLDINGS, INC. ON 04/06/2021
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION/INSPECTION OF DOCUMENTS OR THINGS FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 04/01/2021
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/12/2021
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/14/2021
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 06/16/2021
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/16/2021
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/16/2021
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY ALSTON, MACKENZIE ON 06/18/2021
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 06/16/2021
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41206227 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/22/2021 02:07:00 PM.
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE 06/23/2021 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY ALSTON, MACKENZIE ON 06/23/2021
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY RAILS, AMBERLEE; BURKHART, BRANDON; CANOP HOLDINGS, INC. ON 07/08/2021
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 07/09/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00REPLY - OTHER FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 07/22/2021
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY RAILS, AMBERLEE; BURKHART, BRANDON; CANOP HOLDINGS, INC. ON 07/16/2021
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY ALSTON, MACKENZIE ON 07/27/2021
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00OBJECTION FILED BY RAILS, AMBERLEE; BURKHART, BRANDON; CANOP HOLDINGS, INC. ON 07/26/2021
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 07/22/2021
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/28/2021
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 07/29/2021 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 07/29/2021
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31047915 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 08/06/2021
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 08/17/2021
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1879878 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE 08/23/2021 04:00:00 PM.
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 08/19/2021
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00AMENDED COMPLAINT (SECOND AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL) FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 08/06/2021
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/31/2021
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY RAILS, AMBERLEE; BURKHART, BRANDON; CANOP HOLDINGS, INC. ON 08/23/2021
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND RECEIPT FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 09/14/2021
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 09/09/2021
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/30/2021 04:10:00 PM.
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/30/2021
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/01/2021
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY RAILS, AMBERLEE; BURKHART, BRANDON; CANOP HOLDINGS, INC. ON 10/08/2021
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1909401 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00REQUEST - OTHER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE) FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 10/26/2021
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00AMENDED COMPLAINT (THIRD) FILED BY BURKHART, BRANDON; CANOP HOLDINGS, INC. ON 10/25/2021
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 11/16/2021 03:21:00 PM.
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 02/03/2022
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 12/03/2021
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR DEMURRER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT 02/17/2022 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/24/2022
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 03/03/2022
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR DEMURRER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT 03/03/2022 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1900837 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/11/2022
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR UNDER SUBMISSION RULING 03/08/2022 09:47:00 AM.
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY CANOP HOLDINGS, INC.; RAILS, AMBERLEE; BURKHART, BRANDON ON 03/11/2022
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/11/2022.
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1967605 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/24/2022
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41313913 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 03/29/2022 10:51:00 AM.
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 03/28/2022
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER (REJECTED) FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 04/01/2022
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00AMENDED COMPLAINT (THIRD) FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 04/14/2022
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 03/29/2022
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 5) FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 04/14/2022
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 04/14/2022
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 3) FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 04/14/2022
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 4) FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 04/14/2022
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 6) FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 04/14/2022
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 04/29/2022
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 04/27/2022
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/16/2022
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 05/20/2022
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1962369 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-06-07T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR 05/27/2022 01:56:00 PM.
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 08/25/2022
Date: 2022-08-25T00:00:00MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 08/29/2022
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 08/25/2022
Date: 2022-08-25T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/29/2022
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 08/29/2022
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 02/03/2020
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 02/03/2020
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 02/03/2020
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CRANDALL, JAMES ON 02/03/2020.
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 02/10/2020
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 02/20/2020
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 02/21/2020
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 02/10/2020
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED ON 03/04/2020
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/05/2020
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 02/24/2020
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 03/05/2020
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 03/05/2020
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41074370 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 03/05/2020
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION/INSPECTION OF DOCUMENTS OR THINGS FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 08/29/2022
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 08/29/2022
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2022-09-01T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/01/2022
Date: 2022-09-01T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/01/2022 03:02:00 PM.
Date: 2022-09-01T00:00:00SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED
Date: 2022-09-01T00:00:00MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED
Date: 2022-09-01T00:00:00MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED
Date: 2022-09-01T00:00:00MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION/INSPECTION OF DOCUMENTS OR THINGS FILED
Date: 2022-09-01T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR UNDER SUBMISSION RULING 09/09/2022 04:05:00 PM.
Date: 2022-09-12T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 09/08/2022 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2022-09-12T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2022-09-12T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41378359 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-09-12T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31200358 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-09-12T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21202774 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-09-12T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41378394 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-09-12T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 11032232 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-09-12T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41378365 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-09-12T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21159431 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-09-14T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1988830 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-09-14T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21202820 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-09-14T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED
Date: 2022-09-13T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 11032203 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-09-14T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41378326 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-09-14T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21202821 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-09-14T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21202757 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-09-14T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41378436 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-09-14T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41378389 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-09-14T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 11032166 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-09-14T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21202715 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-09-14T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21202755 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-09-14T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 11034027 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-09-14T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41380241 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-09-14T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31200274 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-09-14T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31200253 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-09-14T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41378345 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-09-14T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 11034018 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-09-14T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21202721 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-09-14T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21202792 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-09-14T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41378338 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-09-15T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21202787 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-09-14T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 11032217 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-09-14T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21204613 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-09-14T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/16/2022
Date: 2022-09-16T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21214072 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31214975 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-10-13T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 11046856 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-10-10T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/07/2022
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/28/2022
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/20/2022
Date: 2022-10-20T00:00:00CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY BURKHART, BRANDON; CANOP HOLDINGS, INC. ON 10/13/2022
Date: 2022-10-13T00:00:00STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY PIERCE, JUSTIN; ALSTON, KENNETH; ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 06/22/2021
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY ALSTON, MACKENZIE ON 06/23/2021
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 06/24/2021
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00REPLY TO MOTION FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 06/24/2021
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY RAILS, AMBERLEE; BURKHART, BRANDON; CANOP HOLDINGS, INC. ON 06/30/2021
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY RAILS, AMBERLEE; BURKHART, BRANDON; CANOP HOLDINGS, INC. ON 06/30/2021
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY RAILS, AMBERLEE; BURKHART, BRANDON; CANOP HOLDINGS, INC. ON 06/30/2021
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY RAILS, AMBERLEE; BURKHART, BRANDON; CANOP HOLDINGS, INC. ON 06/30/2021
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY RAILS, AMBERLEE; BURKHART, BRANDON; CANOP HOLDINGS, INC. ON 06/30/2021
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41213072 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION 07/01/2021 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 07/08/2021
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FILED BY BURKHART, BRANDON; CANOP HOLDINGS, INC. ON 09/26/2022
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER (REJECTED) FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 10/28/2022
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 10/28/2022
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 11/03/2022
Date: 2022-11-03T00:00:00ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY PIERCE, JUSTIN; ALSTON, KENNETH; ROUTE FOUR, LLC ON 11/07/2022
Date: 2022-11-07T00:00:00STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 11/04/2022
Date: 2022-11-04T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 11/22/2022
Date: 2022-11-22T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/01/2022
Date: 2022-12-01T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/08/2022
Date: 2022-12-08T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY BURKHART, BRANDON ON 12/01/2022
Date: 2022-12-01T00:00:00EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 12/14/2022
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/14/2022
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00CASE REASSIGNED TO THOMAS MCCONVILLE EFFECTIVE 01/09/2023.
Date: 2022-12-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 12/16/2022
Date: 2022-12-16T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 12/15/2022 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2022-12-15T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 12/14/2022
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE
Date: 2023-01-17T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/03/2023
Date: 2023-02-03T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE
Date: 2023-01-25T00:00:00SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY RAILS, AMBERLEE ON 02/28/2023
Date: 2023-02-28T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/30/2023
Date: 2023-03-30T00:00:00SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY BURKHART, BRANDON ON 02/28/2023
Date: 2023-02-28T00:00:00SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY CANOP HOLDINGS, INC. ON 03/03/2023
Date: 2023-03-03T00:00:00SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY ATHENA PRODUCTS, INC. ON 02/28/2023
Date: 2023-02-28T00:00:00SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY LUXX LIGHTING, INC. ON 02/28/2023
Date: 2023-02-28T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 04/17/2023
Date: 2023-04-17T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 04/19/2023
Date: 2023-04-19T00:00:00SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY THE SCOTTS MIRACLE-GRO COMPANY ON 03/16/2023
Date: 2023-03-16T00:00:00SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY HAWTHORNE HYDROPONICS, LLC ON 03/16/2023
Date: 2023-03-16T00:00:00SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY THE HAWTHORNE GARDENING COMPANY ON 03/16/2023
Date: 2023-03-16T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 12/08/2022
Date: 2022-12-08T00:00:00SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY THE HAWTHORNE COLLECTIVE, INC. ON 03/16/2023
Date: 2023-03-16T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 12/01/2022
Date: 2022-12-01T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 05/10/2023
Date: 2023-05-10T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/31/2023
Date: 2023-05-31T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 02/03/2023
Date: 2023-02-03T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 07/31/2023
Date: 2023-07-31T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/03/2023
Date: 2023-07-03T00:00:00WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FILED BY RAILS, AMBERLEE; BURKHART, BRANDON; CANOP HOLDINGS, INC. ON 04/17/2023
Date: 2023-04-17T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 07/31/2023
Date: 2023-07-31T00:00:00REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 07/31/2023
Date: 2023-07-31T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/03/2023 11:05:00 AM.
Date: August 03, 2023NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY BURKHART, BRANDON ON 08/01/2023
Date: 2023-08-01T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: August 03, 2023EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY ROUTE FOUR LLC ON 07/31/2023
Date: 2023-07-31T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE
Date: 2023-08-01T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.