Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
California Casualty Insurance Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Abigail Bobinski, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Corey Scott Cramin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCorey Scott Cramin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2019 |
CategoryUninsured Motorist |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CALIFORNIA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 12/26/2019
Date: 2019-12-26T00:00:00PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY CALIFORNIA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 03/16/2020
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/04/2020 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY CALIFORNIA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 12/26/2019
Date: 2019-12-26T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CALIFORNIA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 09/28/2020
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 11/04/2020 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER (RE: VENUE) FILED BY CALIFORNIA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 12/26/2019
Date: 2019-12-26T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CALIFORNIA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 12/26/2019
Date: 2019-12-26T00:00:00PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY CALIFORNIA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/17/2020
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00APPLICATION AND ORDER FILED BY CALIFORNIA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 03/23/2021
Date: March 23, 2021MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 03/17/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: March 17, 2021MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 01/06/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41158359 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/23/2021.
Date: March 23, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.